Rivera v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al

Plaintiff: Angel Rivera
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, Office of Information Policy and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2011cv02072
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's March 30, 2012 Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 8 ) is granted to the extent that the Court has reviewed Plaintiff's claims. Because the Court lacks jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claims, the Court declines to reopen this action. Plaintiff's March 30, 2012 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 9 ) is denied as moot. This case must remain closed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/11/2012.(KMG)
January 13, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; within 30 days Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/13/12.(REW)
October 28, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/28/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Information Policy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?