Galassini v. Fountain Hills, Town of et al

Plaintiff: Dina Galassini
Defendant: Fountain Hills, Town of, Bevelyn Bender and Andrew McGuire
Intervenor_defendant: Arizona, State of
Case Number: 2:2011cv02097
Filed: October 26, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS DECLARED that the definition of "political committee" in A.R.S. § 16-901(19) is vague, overbroad, and consequently unconstitutional in violation of the First Amendment. ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgme nt in favor of Plaintiff and against the State on Plaintiff's claim for declaratory judgment. ORDERED that to the extent the State's 113 Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Seeking Injunction as Remedy is a motion for reconsideration of the Court's ruling at Doc. 106 , it is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the State's 147 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/4/2014.(LFIG)
July 17, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT pursuant to the parties' 137 Joint Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). ORDERED that the Consent Judgment is APPROVED and ADOPTED as the final judgment of this Court as to all claims between Dina Galassini and the Town. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), the Court finds there is no just reason for delay in entering this judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/16/2014.(LFIG)
June 4, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/4/2014. (TLB)
September 30, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth in the attached Order; FURTHER ORDERED that within five (5) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a notice with this Court indic ating whether she seeks an injunction consist with this Order. FURTHER ORDERED denying 83 State of Arizona's Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED denying 84 Town of Fountain Hills' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/30/2013.(TLB)
November 3, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/03/2011. (JAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galassini v. Fountain Hills, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Galassini
Represented By: Steven M Simpson
Represented By: Timothy David Keller
Represented By: Paul Vincent Avelar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fountain Hills, Town of
Represented By: David A Pennartz
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Murray
Represented By: Susan P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bevelyn Bender
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McGuire
Represented By: David A Pennartz
Represented By: Susan P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: James Evans Barton
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?