Pettit v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Ron Zachary Pettit
Defendant: Unknown Pinson, Unknown McClellan, Unknown Smith, Unknown Morrow, Unknown Mueller, Unknown Laque, Unknown Scott, Unknown Curran, Unknown Nelson, Unknown Parties and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2011cv02139
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2014 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 219 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/9/2014.(DGC, nvo)
July 24, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 125 ). 2. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 125 ) is denied. 3. The Court will seek volunteer co unsel to represent Plaintiff at trial if Plaintiff would like counsel. Within 20 days of this order, Plaintiff shall file a short memorandum stating whether he would like the Court to solicit volunteer counsel to represent him at trial. 4. The Court will set a final pretrial conference after it receives Plaintiff's response on volunteer counsel. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/24/13. (LAD)
January 31, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Plaintiff's 8 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Count II and Defendants Ryan, Curran, Scott, McClellan, Nelson, Pinson, and the Eyman Complex Facility Health Administrator and Health Services Regio nal Operations Director are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Smith, Morrow, Lague, and Mueller must answer Count I. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1), this Order, and both summons and r equest for waiver forms for Defendants Smith, Morrow, Lague, and Mueller. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. Plaintiff's 10 , 11 , motions for appo intment of counsel are denied. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/31/12. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettit v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Laque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Zachary Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?