Murray v. Corrections Corporation of America Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Dwight Murray
Defendant: Gina Sween, Joe Stichen, Lorie LaClare, Charles DeRosa, Kash Elkins, Cary Davis and Unknown Bermudes
Case Number: 2:2011cv02210
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to the Parties' 50 Stipulation, all claims filed in this action as to Defendant Cary Davis only shall be dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/9/13. (REW)
November 13, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, adopting the Magistrate Judge's 36 Report and Recommendation, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), the claims as against defendants Joe Stichen and Lorie LaClare are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/12/12. (REW)
July 9, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Plaintiff's Motion for Prelimianry Injunction 14 and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 15 ; denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss, the motion to dismiss is granted as to Count II, the motion to dismiss is otherwise denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/7/12.(REW)
November 30, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendant Corrections Corporation of America is dismissed. Plaintiff's claims, other than the First Amendment claim, are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Bermudes, Sween, Stichen, LaClare, DeRosa, Elkins, and Davis must answer the F irst Amendment claim in Plaintiff's Complaint. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/28/11. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Corrections Corporation of America Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Sween
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Stichen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie LaClare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles DeRosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kash Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bermudes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Murray
Represented By: Joseph Earl Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?