Whitney v. Percell et al

Plaintiff: Carol E Whitney
Defendant: Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated, Unknown Parties, United States of America, Renee A Percell and Unknown Percell
Case Number: 2:2011cv02256
Filed: November 16, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 125 Stipulation of Dismissal (Stipulated Motion to Dismiss): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing with prejudice any and all claims with all parties to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/21/14. (LAD)
June 19, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/28/2014. Dispositive motions due by 4/14/2014. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/18/13. (LAD)
May 22, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 11 Motion for Reconsideration. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/22/12.(LAD)
April 16, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss and this matter is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days, the Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate this lawsuit. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/16/12.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney v. Percell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Family Health Center Incorporated
Represented By: Suzanne M Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Suzanne M Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee A Percell
Represented By: Suzanne M Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Percell
Represented By: Suzanne M Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol E Whitney
Represented By: Frank Verderame
Represented By: Bernard Elliot Grysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?