Garcia v. Glendale Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Garcia, Sr.
Defendant: Isac Imes, Joseph M Arpaio, Glendale Elementary School District No. 40, Glendale Union High School District No. 205, Arizona State Prison System, United States Army, Donald LaBrant, Unknown Yattes, Maricopa County Integrated Health System, Phoenix, City of, Arizona, State of, Phoenix Police Department, Maricopa County Sheriff's Department, Maricopa County 4th Avenue Jail, Glendale Justice Court, Unknown Parties, Glendale Police Department and Glendale, City of
Case Number: 2:2011cv02260
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff Robert A. Garcia's 144 Motion for Reassignment ofhis Case; denying Plaintiff's 145 146 149 Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/23/14.(CLB)
March 25, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 142 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. ORDERED denying as moot 141 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Joint Pretrial Final Proposed Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/25/2014.(TLB)
March 10, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution 119 is granted; this case is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff shall take nothing; the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case; all relief sought by Plaintiff in his Response 133 is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff seeking his requested relief in the appropriate forum; all remaining motions 60 , 94 , 95 , 98 , 110 , 116 , 120 , 123 , 124 , 125 , 129 , 130 , 131 , 132 , 134 , 137 are denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/10/14. (REW)
February 10, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 127 Order. VACATING Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 4:00 PM. to permit Plaintiff time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute (Doc. 119 ). ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss (Doc. 119 ) on or before 2/28/2014. ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to timely respond to the motion to dismiss (Doc. 119 ), the Court will deem Plaintiff's failure to respond to be Plaintiff's consent to the motion be ing granted under Local Rule Civil 7.2(i). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/10/2014. (Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff Robert A. Garcia on 2/10/2014). (Order Amended to correct text vacating Final pretrial conference date of 2/19/2014, not 2/29/2014.)(TLB)
November 25, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Criminal Charges: denying 91 Plaintiff's Motion to File 2nd Amended Complaint; denying as moot 85 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel; denying as moot 84 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Public Interest Awareness. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/25/13.(TLB)
October 18, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 74 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial and denying 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/18/2013. (Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff Robert Garcia on 10/18/2013).(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Glendale Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isac Imes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Elementary School District No. 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Union High School District No. 205
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona State Prison System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald LaBrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Yattes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Integrated Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County 4th Avenue Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Justice Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Garcia, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?