Johnson v. Clark

Plaintiff: Robert Earl Johnson
Defendant: Unknown Clark
Case Number: 2:2011cv02287
Filed: November 22, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Plaintif's 42 Motion for Sanctions, 44 Request for Leave to Amend Pleading to Add a Defendant and the 45 Application for Entry of Default are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff show c ause in writing on or before Friday, March 8, 2013 why his claims against Defendant Clark and this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve process on Defendant Clark pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/21/2013. (LFIG)
October 2, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Request for Service by Publication is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/2/2012.(LFIG)
September 24, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Direct Payment by the United States of the Expenses for Service by Publication is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/24/2012.(LFIG)
July 30, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Service by Publication (Third Request) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have an additional ninety (90) days in which to fully comply with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S Marshal Service shall personally serve Defendant Clark at the last known address provided under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/27/2012.(LFIG) (See attached PDF for complete details.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Earl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?