Quintana v. Bank of America NA et al

Plaintiff: Karoly Quintana
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Incorporated, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Unknown Parties and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 2:2011cv02301
Filed: November 21, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The motion to dismiss count 4 (the Arizona Consumer Fraud Act claim) is granted. The motion is denied in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Clarification as set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/24/2014.(TLB)
April 1, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 14 is granted conditioned on: (1) Plaintiff filing an amended complaint by 8:00 a.m. 4/2/ 2013; and (2) Plaintiff posting a bond with the Clerk in the amount of $2,600.00 by 8:15 a.m. 4 /2/13; Plaintiff shall post another bond in the same amount on the 2nd of each month thereafter (or the following Monday, if the 2nd falls on a weekend or holiday); failing which, Defendants may move to dissolve the injunction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/1/13. (REW)
March 27, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 13 Motion to Reopen; the Clerk shall reopen this case; Plaintiff shall complete service within 20 days of this order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/27/13.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintana v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Incorporated
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karoly Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?