Pember v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Jay Lynn Pember
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Unknown Ramos, Unknown Barrios, Unknown Heet, Stacey Crabtree, Unknown Woods, Unknown Miser, Unknown Linderman, Unknown Parties, James Yielding, Unknown Ford and Unknown Owens
Case Number: 2:2011cv02332
Filed: November 28, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 73 ; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 73 is granted and the action is terminated with prejudice; the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/2/15.(REW)
July 11, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER adopting the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. 61 ) regarding Defendant Payne's dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing without prejudice Defendant Payne. FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaint iff's Motion for Extension of Time - for 30 Day Extension to Serve Defendant Who Has Returned From Military Leave (Doc. 64 ) on the grounds that Plaintiff has failed to show good cause or excusable neglect. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing without pr ejudice Defendant Musson because Plaintiff failed to effect service within the time limits of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall furnish a copy of this Order to Magistrate Judge Metcalf. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/11/2014. (KMG)
June 24, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 66 Motion to Modify Deadlines and 67 Motion to Compel Discovery are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/24/2014.(LFIG)
March 24, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Re-File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint to Correct Error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/24/2014.(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pember v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Lynn Pember
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Miser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Linderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?