Moreno v. Beddome et al

Plaintiff: Oscar Shaun Moreno
Defendant: Maricopa, County of, C J Beddome, Selethia Downs and James Garitson
Case Number: 2:2011cv02333
Filed: November 28, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's 35 Notice of Appeal, construed as a motion to reopen the time to file a Notice of Appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(6), is denied, re: 13-15297. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/13. (REW)
August 31, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Complaint and this action are DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/31/2012. (KMG)
August 2, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 16 ). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 16) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/2/2012.(KMG)
December 6, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Doc. 3 is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initi al partial filing fee of $8.71. Count Two and Defendants Arpaio, Correctional Health Services, Medical Staff 1 to 20, and Detention Staff 1 to 20 are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Maricopa County, Beddome, Downs, and Garitson must ans wer Count One of the Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Maricopa County, Beddome, Downs, and Garitson. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/6/2011. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Beddome et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: Ann Thompson Uglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C J Beddome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selethia Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Garitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Shaun Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?