Ceiling Fan Software LLC et al v. Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs seek a declaratory judgment that Ceiling Fan Software, LLC is not infringing any rights, copyright or otherwise, owned by Defendants Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Vivendi Games, Inc. Plaintiff develops and sells software programs including one under the name Pocket Gnome that enables its users to automate features and steps in Blizzard's World of Warcraft.

Plaintiff: Brian Becker, Stanton Fraser and Ceiling Fan Software LLC
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated and Vivendi Games Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv02357
Filed: November 30, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2012 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case , MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Transfer to Central District of California by Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, Vivendi Games Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rod Rigole, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Marc)
January 23, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 23, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX117998 as to Karin G Pagnanelli. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 23, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX117997 as to Marc E Mayer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 23, 2012 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Karin G Pagnanelli on behalf of defendants Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, and Vivendi Games Incorporated. (BAS)
January 23, 2012 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marc E Meyer on behalf of defendants Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, and Vivendi Games Incorporated. (BAS)
January 11, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the 8 Stipulation of the parties, Defendants may have an extension of time from 01/11/12 to 01/25/12 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. In future requests parties must disclose the reason the extension is needed. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 01/11/12. (ESL)
January 10, 2012 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, Vivendi Games Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Shwer, Bradley)
December 15, 2011 7 Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Chief Judge Roslyn O. Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 11-2357-PHX-ROS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 14, 2011 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 30, 2011 5 Summons Issued as to Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, Vivendi Games Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 30, 2011 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-6114045. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-02357-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
November 30, 2011 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ceiling Fan Software LLC (submitted by Lance Venable). (REK)
November 30, 2011 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Brian Becker, Ceiling Fan Software LLC, Stanton Fraser (Lance Venable). (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(REK)
November 30, 2011 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-6114045, filed by Ceiling Fan Software LLC, Brian Becker, Stanton Fraser (submitted by Lance Venable). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceiling Fan Software LLC et al v. Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Becker
Represented By: Joseph Richard Meaney
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanton Fraser
Represented By: Joseph Richard Meaney
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceiling Fan Software LLC
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable
Represented By: Joseph Richard Meaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivendi Games Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?