Wilson v. Barcklay et al

Plaintiff: Van L Wilson
Defendant: Karen Barcklay, Unknown Defranco, Unknown Salazar and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv02376
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Mohave
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER tht the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Barcklay's Motion to Dismiss Count II (Doc. 7). Defendant Barcklay's Motion to Dismiss Count II 7 is granted, and Barcklay is dismissed and Count II is dismissed without prejudice. The remaining claim is Count I against the Doe Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/10/12.(DMT)
March 23, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet)- IT IS ORDERED: Count III is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Defranco and Salazar are dismissed without prejudice.Defendant Barcklay must answer Count II of the First Amended Complaint.The Clerk of Court must send Plai ntiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 4), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Barcklay. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/21/12. (LAD)
January 13, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The summons issued by the Clerk of Court on December 6, 2011 is quashed. (2) The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amend ed complaint in compliance with this Order. (3) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/13/12. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Barcklay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van L Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Barcklay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?