Moree v. Carrier IQ Incorporated et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jerimiah Thomas Moree
Defendant: Carrier IQ Incorporated, HTC Incorporated and HTC America Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv02409
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2510
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2012 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerimiah Thomas Moree. HTC Incorporated served on 12/16/2011. (Holland, Eric)
January 25, 2012 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerimiah Thomas Moree. HTC America Incorporated served on 12/16/2011. (Holland, Eric)
January 10, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to 16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint, the deadline for Defendants Carrier IQ and HTC America, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint in the above-captioned case shall be extended until 45 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues an order deciding the MDL motion, or as otherwise ordered by the MDL transferee court if the MDL motion is granted; provided, however, that in the event Defendant Carrier IQ or Defendant HTC America, Inc., should agree to an earlier response date in any of the MDL cases, Defendant Carrier IQ or Defendant HTC America, Inc., whoever of these two Defendants has so agreed, will respond to the complaint in the above-captioned case on that agreed date. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/10/12. (see order for full details)(DMT)
January 6, 2012 17 NOTICE re Notice Of Lodging Order by HTC America Incorporated re 16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jennifer)
January 6, 2012 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re 1 Complaint (First Request) by HTC America Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jennifer)
January 6, 2012 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HTC America Incorporated. (Baker, Jennifer)
January 6, 2012 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Amy Baker on behalf of HTC America Incorporated (Baker, Jennifer)
December 23, 2011 13 NOTICE re Notice of Related Actions by Jerimiah Thomas Moree . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - JPML Notice of Related Actions, # 2 Exhibit B - JPML Motion for Transfer, # 3 Exhibit C - JPML Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer, # 4 Exhibit D - JPML Docket Sheet)(Holland, Eric)
December 21, 2011 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerimiah Thomas Moree. Carrier IQ Incorporated served on 12/12/2011. (Holland, Eric)
December 20, 2011 11 Summons (Notice from National Registered Agents, Inc.) Returned Unexecuted as to HTC Incorporated. (DMT)
December 16, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
December 16, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX116897 as to Steven J Stolze. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 16, 2011 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steven J Stolze on behalf of plaintiff Jerimiah Thomas Moree. (BAS)
December 16, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX116898 as to Steven L Groves. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 16, 2011 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steven L Groves on behalf of plaintiff Jerimiah Thomas Moree. (BAS)
December 13, 2011 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jerimiah Thomas Moree. (Rosenblatt, Burton)
December 12, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
December 12, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX116695 as to Eric D Holland. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 12, 2011 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Eric D Holland on behalf of Jerimiah Thomas Moree. (BAS)
December 7, 2011 4 Summons Issued as to Carrier IQ Incorporated, HTC America Incorporated, HTC Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 7, 2011 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-6142570. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-02409-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
December 7, 2011 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jerimiah Thomas Moree (submitted by Burton Rosenblatt). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(REK)
December 7, 2011 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-6142570, filed by Jerimiah Thomas Moree (submitted by Burton Rosenblatt). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moree v. Carrier IQ Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerimiah Thomas Moree
Represented By: Steven L Groves
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Represented By: Burton Rosenblatt
Represented By: Steven J Stolze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier IQ Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?