Stoller v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller
Defendant: Law Firm of Miles, Bauer, Bergstrom & Winters LLP, Joseph M Arpaio, Unknown Parties, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, Robert P Kelly, Gerald L Hassell, Thomas P Gibbons, Carl Krasik, Bank of America, Walter E Massey, Joe Price, Brian T Moynihan, Countrywide Bank NA, John Hall & Associates and Reconstruct Company NA
Case Number: 2:2011cv02454
Filed: December 12, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Complaint and this action are dismissed. Plaintiff's pending motions are denied. (Doc. 37, 59.) The Clerk must enter judgment of dismissal. The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/26/12.(DMT)
February 14, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/14/12.(DMT)
February 9, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's 35 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Plaintiff's 44 motion for entry of default and default judgment is denied. Plaintiff's 42 motion to show cause is construed as a Response to the Court's January 3, 2012 Order requiring him to show cause. Within 14 days of the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a memorandum of points and authorities to support his Response (Doc. 42), to the Court's January 3, 2012 Order. If Plaint iff fails to file a memorandum of points of authorities in support of his Response within 14 days, the Clerk of Court must enter judgment of dismissal of this action without further notice. Plaintiff's 40 motion for injunctive relief is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/9/12.(DMT)
January 13, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for TRO; for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/13/12.(DMT)
January 3, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas) and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel denying 12 Motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoller v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Miles, Bauer, Bergstrom & Winters LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P Kelly
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald L Hassell
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P Gibbons
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Krasik
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter E Massey
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Price
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T Moynihan
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank NA
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hall & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reconstruct Company NA
Represented By: Shayna Nicole Fernandez
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?