Wilkinson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Christopher C Wilkinson and Laura L Wilkinson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA, Quality Loan Service Corporation, TruCap Grantor Trust 2010-2, Marix Servicing LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv02467
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs shall pay to Defendants $7,620.00 in attorneys' fees and $661.41 in costs. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/2012.(NVO)
May 22, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' TruCap Grantor Trust 2010-2 and Marix Servicing LLC's 38 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendants' 42 Motion for Ruling is deemed to be moot. Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/22/12. (LFIG)
March 14, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss Party; Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA terminated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/14/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkinson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher C Wilkinson
Represented By: Scott Alan MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura L Wilkinson
Represented By: Scott Alan MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Sornsin
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Lakshmi Jagannath
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruCap Grantor Trust 2010-2
Represented By: Lakshmi Jagannath
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marix Servicing LLC
Represented By: Lakshmi Jagannath
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?