Mendiola-Martinez v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Miriam Mendiola-Martinez
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Maricopa Medical Center and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv02512
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling upon resolution of Plaintiff's appeal 137 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/3/2014.(DGC, nvo)
January 22, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: MCSHCD's motion for summary judgment 72 and the County Defendants' motion for summary judgment 89 are granted. Plaintiff's motions for partial summary judgment 91 and 92 are denied. All other pending motions Docs. 96 , 102 , 117 are denied as moot. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/22/2014.(ALS)
November 19, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss Party; party Maricopa County Board of Supervisors terminated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/19/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendiola-Martinez v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Mendiola-Martinez
Represented By: Joy Malby Bertrand
Represented By: John William McBee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?