Verco Decking Incorporated v. Consolidated Systems Incorporated

Plaintiff: Verco Decking Incorporated
Defendant: Consolidated Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv02516
Filed: December 20, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting in part and denying in part the Third Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery 97 ; Dispositive Motions due 11/21/14 (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/8/14.(REW)
May 15, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Seal Unredacted Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Claim Construction. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/15/14.(MAP)
May 13, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within seven (7) days of this Order, Verco shall file an amended deposition transcript or affidavit as explained in this Order. ORDERED that ruling on the 71 Motion is deferred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 79 Motion to File Surreply Claim Construction Brief is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the lodged surreply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/13/2014.(LFIG)
December 23, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses (Doc. 49 ) is granted in part and denied in part. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/20/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verco Decking Incorporated v. Consolidated Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verco Decking Incorporated
Represented By: Marvin A Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?