Cochran v. Wardian et al

Plaintiff: Howard Cochran
Defendant: Michael Caggiano, Todd Everett, Unknown Party and Mark Wardian
Case Number: 2:2011cv02538
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/15/13.(LSP)
April 26, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Howard Cochran. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/25/12. (LFIG)
April 4, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counts I and III are dismissed without prejudice and Defendants Michael Hiatt, Robert Ramsey, Christopher Smith, Doe, Michael Caggiano and Todd Everett are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Wardian must answer Count II. The Clerk mu st send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 9), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Wardian. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 2 1 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/4/12. (LSP)
February 6, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/6/12.(LSP)
February 1, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Howard Cochran. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/1/12. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. Wardian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Caggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wardian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?