Ellsworth v. Kendall et al

Plaintiff: James Jackson Ellsworth
Defendant: Dennis Kendall and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv02554
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees pursuant to Stipulation 54 . Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/9/13. (TLJ)
May 23, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 24 . ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting as to Kendall and Jimenez and as to any official-capacity claim for damages against Dacumos; Kendall and Jimenez are dismissed; and denied in all other respects. This matter is referred to a Magistrate Judge for the purposes of settlement. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/22/13.(TLJ)
April 11, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/10/13.(TLJ)
May 18, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for District Court Assistance to the extent set forth in this order. Paul Edward Carter, Office of the Attorney General, Liability Management Section, shall provide the forwarding address for defendant R ose Dacumos, if any, to the United States Marshal in a confidential memorandum indicating that the summons and complaint is to be delivered to that address on or before July 2, 2012; Within thirty (30) days of receipt of any available address from at torney Carter, the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of plaintiff's complaint and summons upon defendant Rose Dacumos in accordance with this order and the court's January 10, 2012 order granting, inter alia, plaintiff leave to proce ed in forma pauperis.The Clerk of the Court shall provide a copy of: (1) the court's January 10, 2012 order (Doc. 5]; (2) this order; (3) the complaint, summons and a blank U.S. Marshal form 285 to the attorney Carter for purposes of re-attempti ng service as to defendant Rose Dacumos; Alternatively, if attorney Carter is unable to procure defendant Rose Dacumos' address from the Florence facility, he shall notify this court and plaintiff in writing by no later than July 2, 2012. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/18/12. (the service packet is being mailed to Atty Carter this date)(DMT)
January 10, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James Jackson Ellsworth. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/10/12. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellsworth v. Kendall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jackson Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?