Brown-Hunter v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Kim Brown-Hunter
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2011cv02573
Filed: December 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; pursuant to Rule 24(a)(4), Fed. R. App. P., the clerk shall immediately notify the parties and the court of appeals of this denial re: 16-15463. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/12/16.(REW)
January 20, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Application for Attorney Fees. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/20/2016.(LMR)
December 5, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's motion to exceed the page limits on her reply (doc. 20 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AFFIRMING the decision of the Commissioner denying disability benefits. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/4/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown-Hunter v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Brown-Hunter
Represented By: Eric Glenn Slepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?