WB Music Corporation et al v. 8402-8404 Corporation et al

Plaintiff: WB Music Corporation, Ain't Nothing But Funkin' Music, Music of Windswept, Blotter Music, Elvis Mambo Music, EMI Full Keel Music Company, Red Instructional Music and Disco Fever Publishing
Defendant: 8402-8404 Corporation and Patrick DeFillippo
Garnishee: American Express Company
Case Number: 2:2011mc00013
Filed: January 31, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs' motion for judgment against Garnishee (Doc. 17) is granted. Plaintiffs' shall have judgment against Garnishee in the amount of $26.97. Garnishee is ordered to remit the sum of $26.97 to Plaintiffs through their c ounsel of record. Garnishee is discharged on the writ of garnishment served on April 28, 2011. No further motion for judgment is pending before the Court. The Clerk therefore is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/12/2011.(KMG)
May 26, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT that Plaintiffs' 13 motion for judgment against Garnishee is granted. Plaintiffs shall have judgment against Garnishee in the amount of $179.29. Garnishee is ordered to remit the sum of $179.29 to Plaintiffs through their counsel of record. Garnishee is discharged on the writ of garnishment served on March 23, 2011 (Doc. 9). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 05/26/11.(ESL)
April 8, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT, that Plaintiffs' 6 motion for judgment against Garnishee is granted. Plaintiffs shall have judgment against Garnishee in the amount of $199.86. Garnishee is ordered to remit the sum of $199.86 to Plaintiffs through their counsel of record. Garnishee is discharged on the writ of garnishment served on 02/09/11 (Doc. 5). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 04/08/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Music Corporation et al v. 8402-8404 Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corporation
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ain't Nothing But Funkin' Music
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music of Windswept
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blotter Music
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Mambo Music
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Full Keel Music Company
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Instructional Music
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disco Fever Publishing
Represented By: Peter J Rathwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8402-8404 Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick DeFillippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?