Snyder v. HSBC Bank USA NA et al

Plaintiff: Susan M Snyder
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA NA, Les Zieve, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv00016
Filed: January 3, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants HSBC and Ocwen's Motion to Dismiss, doc. 51, is GRANTED. This action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state plausible claims upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court is kindly directe d to terminate this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants HSBC and Ocwen's Request for Judicial Notice, doc. 52, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, because the briefing is adequate and oral argument would not aid the Court, Defen dants' request for oral argument is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pages 18 through 22 of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, doc. 65, are STRICKEN from consideration due to Plaintiff's violation of LRCiv 7.2(e)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/26/12.(LAD)
August 29, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 47 Motion for Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Les Zieve is awarded attorney's fees and non-taxable costs in the amount of $1,984.48 (fees of $ 1,950.00 plus $34.48 in costs normally charged to a fee-paying client). The Clerk is kindly directed to enter Judgment on Attorney's Fees and Costs in the amount of $1,984.48 in favor of Les Zieve and against Plaintiff Susan M. Snyder, nunc pro tunc to June 8, 2012, which shall earn interest at the annual federal rate from the date of entry of the June 8, 2012 Judgment until paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/28/2012.(LFIG)
July 13, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that former Defendant Les Zieve's Declaration re: Defendant's Request for Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Cost [sic], doc. 43, is STRICKEN without prejudice. If former Defendant Les Zieve timely and fully complies with this Order, his refiled Declaration re: Defendant's Request for Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Cost [sic] shall relate back to its initial filing date pursuant to Rule 15(c), Fed.R.Civ.P. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that former Defendant may re-file his Declaration re: Defendant's Request for Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Cost [sic] on or before Monday July 23, 2012 which, if re-filed, shall be substantively identical to the June 25, 2012 filing, except he shall comply in all respects with this Order and the Local Rules or the Court may deny ab initio his request for fees. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/13/12. (LAD)
June 18, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 37 Defendants HSBC and Ocwen's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Pending Motion Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 3.7(c), is sustained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/18/12. (LSP)
June 8, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants HSBC and Ocwens Motion to Dismiss, doc.10, is GRANTED. The Complaint is dismissed as to Defendants HSBC and Ocwen without prejudice for failure to state claims upon which relief may be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that should Plaintiff seek to bring an amended complaint, she shall file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint no later than Wednesday, June 13, 2012. The motion must attach the proposed amended complaint and comply with the requiremen ts of LRCiv 15.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should Plaintiff seek to bring an amended complaint, she shall file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint no later than Wednesday, June 13, 2012. The motion must attach the proposed amended comp laintand comply with the requirements of LRCiv 15.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Supplemental Pleading, doc. 19, is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Request to Correct Record, doc. 20, which the Court construes as a notice of errata, is DENIED as an unnecessary motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/8/12.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. HSBC Bank USA NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA NA
Represented By: Charles Anthony Piccuta
Represented By: Christopher Robert Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Christopher Robert Blevins
Represented By: Charles Anthony Piccuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M Snyder
Represented By: George Alfred Tacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?