TSI Incorporated v. Azbil BioVigilant Incorporated

Plaintiff: TSI Incorporated
Defendant: Azbil BioVigilant Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00083
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that BioVigilant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 227 ) is granted. In light of this ruling, the Court concludes that BioVigilant's counterclaims for declaratory relief are moot, and the Clerk is therefore directed to terminate this matter. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/21/2014.(KMG)
March 6, 2014 220 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER That the Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal the documents lodged as Doc. 177 and 181 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/14. (MAP)
March 19, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 100 Memorandum filed by TSI Incorporated, 98 Memorandum filed by Azbil BioVigilant Incorporated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/19/2013. (NVO)
May 1, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court will schedule a case management conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/1/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSI Incorporated v. Azbil BioVigilant Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSI Incorporated
Represented By: Timothy E Grimsrud
Represented By: Ahron David Cohen
Represented By: David JF Gross
Represented By: Andrew Foster Halaby
Represented By: Kenneth Arthur Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azbil BioVigilant Incorporated
Represented By: Sean David Garrison
Represented By: Shane Eric Olafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?