Overstreet et al v. Phoenix, City of et al

Plaintiff: Denise Overstreet and Jerome Overstreet
Defendant: Phoenix, City of, Phoenix Union High School District, Daniel Mendez, Luis Lemus, George Pizarro, Craig Pletnik and Lee Fernwault
Case Number: 2:2012cv00125
Filed: January 19, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 70 District Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment solely on the dismissal with prejudice of Count 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing without prejudice all remaining claims against all remaining Defendants pursuant to the Court's discretion to decline supplementary jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3); denying as moot the District Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in all other regards. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate the case. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/11/2014.(ALS)
February 20, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant City's motion for judgment on the pleadings on Plaintiff's third, seventh, eighth, and ninth claims for relief 48 is granted; Defendant Pizarro is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's claims against Defendant City in count one and four are dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint 51 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/19/13.(REW)
February 19, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; granting 58 Motion for summary adjudication. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/19/2013.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overstreet et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Overstreet
Represented By: Joseph Terry Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Overstreet
Represented By: Joseph Terry Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Lemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Pizarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Pletnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Fernwault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?