Todd v. Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Todd
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, Safeguard Properties LLC, Safeguard Properties Incorporated, Unknown Parties, Chase Home Finance LLC, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation and Chase Fulfillment Services
Case Number: 2:2012cv00129
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 JPMorgan Chase Bank's Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/23/12.(DMT)
June 1, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 31 Motion for Extension of Time to serve defendants Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation and Chase Home Finance LLC. Plaintiff shall have up to and including fifteen days from the date of this order to serve a copy of the summons and amended complaint on Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation and Chase Home Finance LLC. Granting PK Management Group's motion to dismiss 21 . The quiet title claim is dismissed against defendants Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporatio n, Chase Home Finance LLC, and Chase Fulfillment Services. The action is dismissed in its entirety against all remaining defendants. At this stage, only the breach of contract claim against Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, Chase Home Finance LLC, and Chase Fulfillment Services remains. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/31/12.(DMT)
May 25, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's renewed motion for temporary restraining order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/24/12.(LAD)
April 25, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order 11 . Denying plaintiff's motion requesting status of temporary restraining order on grounds of mootness 10 . Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/25/12. (see order for full details)(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Fulfillment Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?