Food Services of America Incorporated v. Carrington et al

Plaintiff: Food Services of America Incorporated
Defendant: Elba Rubio, Unknown Parties and Paul Carrington
Case Number: 2:2012cv00175
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 147 Motion for Reconsideration. (See attached order for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/17/2013.(KFZ)
August 23, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 109 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 111 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; grant ing in part and denying in part 134 Defendant's Motion to Strike and Preclude Plaintiff's Untimely Expert Disclosures. The Court awards $500 for attorneys' fees and costs incurred by Plaintiff in bringing its Motion for Sanctio ns. The declarations (Doc. 111-1, Ex. B(Kuchta Decl.); Doc. 122-1, Ex. 1 (Kuchta Decl.)), are stricken only to the extent that they contain new expert disclosures and not in their entirety (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/23/13.(TLJ)
June 24, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 Plaintiff FSA's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/24/2013.(KFZ)
February 4, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 72 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings on Counts Three through Six is granted. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/4/2013.(LFIG)
November 8, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 37 Motion to Exclude Matters Outside the Pleadings ; granting 43 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Defendants shall file a response by 11/26/12 and Plaintiff's reply shall be due 12/3/12. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/5/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/8/12.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Food Services of America Incorporated v. Carrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elba Rubio
Represented By: Cyrus Benjamin Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Carrington
Represented By: Cyrus Benjamin Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food Services of America Incorporated
Represented By: Richard K Walker
Represented By: Robert L Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?