Casteel v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Everett Gregory Casteel
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2012cv00182
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 53 . Petitioner's Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 13 ) is denied. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cas es, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/19/13. (LAD)
September 17, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Ground Two of the Second Amended Petition is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Second Amended Petition (Doc. 13 ) and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certi fied mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Respondents must answer Grounds One, Three, and Four of the Second Amended Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/17/2012. (KMG)
June 28, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Amended Petition (Doc. 9 ) is dismissed with leave to amend; Petitioner has 30 days from the date this Order is signed to file a second amended petition on a court approved form. The Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of thi s action without prejudice, without further notice to Petitioner, if Petitioner fails to file a second amended petition within 30 days from the date this Order is signed. The Clerk of Court must provide Petitioner with a current, court-approved form for filing a "Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person inState Custody." Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/28/2012. (KMG)
April 25, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Petition (Doc. 1) is dismissed with leave to amend; Petitioner has 30 daysfrom the date this Order is signed to file a an amended petition on a court-approved form. The Clerk o f Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice, without further notice to Petitioner, if Petitioner fails to file an amended petition within 30 days from the date this Order is signed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/25/12. (LAD)
February 13, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a completed A pplication to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/13/2012. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casteel v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Everett Gregory Casteel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?