Adrian et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Adrian and Maria M Adrian
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, MTC Financial Incorporated, Unknown Parties and OneWest Bank FSB
Case Number: 2:2012cv00189
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment: See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/6/2015.(LMR)
August 5, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion for Protective Order. See attached order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/5/2014.(LMR)
April 30, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 defendant's motion to dismiss. All the claims of all the parties having now been resolved, the clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/26/12.(DMT)
March 30, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 MTC Financial Inc's Motion to Dismiss Party; granting 9 Fannie Mae's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/29/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adrian et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Adrian
Represented By: Samin Adib
Represented By: Azadeh Najafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria M Adrian
Represented By: Samin Adib
Represented By: Azadeh Najafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Incorporated
Represented By: William Fred Hyder
Represented By: Richard Joseph Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?