Cheren et al v. Compass Bank et al

Plaintiff: Catherine A Conrad Cheren and David H Cheren
Defendant: BBVA Compass, Compass Bank and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv00206
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Attorney Fees. Compass Bank is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $40,432.50 from Plaintiffs. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/17/13. (LAD)
August 21, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot the 32 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/20/13. (LAD)
June 24, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 26 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Application for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 25 ) is granted: the Court awards Defendant $1,000.00 in attorneys' fees. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/24/13. (LAD)
November 2, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; denying 14 Motion for Sanctions; denying 15 Motion for Sanctions; denying 19 Motion for Sanctions and granting Defendant's request for attorney's fees. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 21 days from the date of this order. If Plaintiffs fail to comply, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment, dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/12.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheren et al v. Compass Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Bank
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine A Conrad Cheren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H Cheren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?