Towery et al v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: Milo McCormick Stanley, Samuel Villegas Lopez, Thomas Arnold Kemp, Robert Charles Towery, Robert Moormann and Pete Rovogich
Defendant: Lance R Hetmer, Unknown Parties, Janice K Brewer, Charles L Ryan and Ron Credio
Case Number: 2:2012cv00245
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion to Continue: The Court will grant the motion with the caveat that argument will be rescheduled if Defendants do not withdraw the motion or if Plaintiffs do not seek leave to file a fourth amended complaint by September 2 8, 2012. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may seek leave to file a fourth amended complaint no later than September 28, 2012. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs seek leave to amend, Defendants shall file a new motion to dismiss no later than fourteen (14) days after filing of the fourth amended complaint. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/17/12.(SJF)
May 30, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' 69 Emergency Motion for Discovery and Preservation of Evidence is DENIED. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/30/12. (NKS)
May 2, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, and the motion may be filed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the lodged motion. ORDER that Defendants file a response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 5/4/12 and Plaintiffs may file a reply by 5/6/12. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/2/12.(TLJ)
February 23, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: 19 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/23/12.(TLJ)
February 15, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limitation and Memorandum in Support. The Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiffs' lodged motion for preliminary injunction 16 . ORDER that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction no later than 5:00 pm on 2/17/12. ORDER that Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than 12:00 pm on 2/20/12. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/15/12.(TLJ)
February 7, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/7/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towery et al v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milo McCormick Stanley
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Villegas Lopez
Represented By: Kelley J Henry
Represented By: Henry Martin
Represented By: Denise I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Arnold Kemp
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Charles Towery
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Represented By: Amanda R Conley
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moormann
Represented By: Denise I Young
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Represented By: Julie Singleton Hall
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Rovogich
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Represented By: Amanda R Conley
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance R Hetmer
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Credio
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?