Smith # 036085 v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Joe Clarence Smith, Jr.
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Ron Credio
Case Number: 2:2012cv00318
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Petitioner's Motion to alter or amend. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/2/14.(LSP)
May 14, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/14/14.(LSP)
April 29, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Respondents shall file a response to 49 Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment no later than 10 days following entry of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/29/14. (LSP)
March 24, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Petitioner's Motion for evidentiary development. The record will be expanded to include the transcript of the September 10, 2004 hearing (Doc. 42 -1, Ex. A). The remainder of the motion is denie d. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 25 ) is denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting a Certificate of Appealabilty with respect to Claims 13 and 23. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/24/14.(LSP)
May 16, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration, see PDF document for details re breifing schedule. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/16/13.(LSP)
May 15, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Petitioner's Motion for 21-Day Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/15/13.(LSP)
April 30, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days of the filing date of this order, Respondents shall file copies of the documents requested in this order. The Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court shall transmit to Brian Karth, Clerk, United States District Court, the Record on Appeal in Maricopa County Superior Court No. 0000-095116. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to: Janet Johnson, Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/30/13. (LSP)
April 16, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; Petitioner shall file a Reply no later than May 22, 2013. See PDF document for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/16/13.(LSP)
December 3, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Habeas Petition is granted. Petitioner shall file a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than December 21, 2012. Respondents shall file an Answer no later than February 19, 2013. Petitioner shall file a Reply no later than March 21, 2013. Any motion for evidentiary development shall be filed no later than April 11, 2013. A response to any motion for evidentiary development shall be filed no later than May 2, 2013. A reply to any response to a motion for evidentiary development shall be filed no later than May 13, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/3/2012.(LFIG)
September 26, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Habeas Petition. Petitioner shall file a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than December 14, 2012. Respondents shall file an Answer no later than February 12, 2013. See PDF document for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/26/12.(LSP)
May 2, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner shall file a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than November 9, 2012, Respondents shall file an Answer no later than January 8, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 17 Respondents' Motion for Order Precluding Contact wiht Victims. See PDF document for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/1/12.(LSP)
March 6, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Case Management Conference is set for 4/17/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/5/12. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith # 036085 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joe Clarence Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Leann Schneider
Represented By: Jon M Sands
Represented By: Michael Llewellyn Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Credio
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?