Christopher v. Spectra Electrical Services Incorporated

Plaintiff: Robert Christopher
Defendant: Spectra Electrical Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00345
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Defendant's motion for costs 134 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys fees 137 is denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs in the amount of $5,644.20. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/2/2014.(ALS)
June 19, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 74 Motion to Strike. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/19/2013.(NVO)
November 9, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's motion to amend 20 is granted. Plaintiff may file his proposed amended complaint in the form attached to his motion on or before 11/14/12. Defendant's motion 17 is granted in part and denied in part. Janet Stratton-Chr istopher is joined as a required Plaintiff. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect her presence in the case a Plaintiff. Plaintiff's counsel promptly shall provide a copy of this order to Ms. Stratton-Christopher. Ms. Stratton-Christopher must notify the Court on or before 12/10/12 whether she has retained counsel or will be representing herself in this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/9/12.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. Spectra Electrical Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectra Electrical Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Christopher
Represented By: Stephen G Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?