Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Ogandzhanova

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Inna Ogandzhanova
Case Number: 2:2012cv00372
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2014 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 235 Motion for Sanctions. The Court will issue to the jury a permissive adverse inference instruction at the trial of this matter noting that Plaintiff did not provide material ordered by the Court from which fact the jury may draw appropriate adverse inferences. MetLife is awarded its reasonable attorneys' fees and expenses incurred in bringing this motion upon compliance with LRCiv 54.2. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/12/14. (LAD)
May 27, 2014 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 280 ) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 282 ) is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/27/2014.(KMG)
April 9, 2013 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Ogandzhanova's request for reserve information relating to her insurance claims. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/9/13. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Ogandzhanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Represented By: Jason M Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inna Ogandzhanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?