Hudson Insurance Company v. Simmons Construction LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Defendant: Unknown Simmons, Todd G Simmons, SKS Investments & Developments LLC, Todd G. Simmons Revocable Trust and Simmons Construction LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00407
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. (Doc. 65 .) FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants, jointly and severally, Simmons ConstructionLLC, SKS Investme nts & Developments LLC, Todd G. Simmons Revocable Trust, and Todd G. Simmons and Jane Doe Simmons, individually and as husband and wife, in the amount of $4,516,191.18, which shall earn post-judgment interest at the applicable federal rate from the date of entry of judgment until paid in full. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/5/2014.(KMG)
November 2, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 33 Rule 59(d) Motion is denied. Plaintiffs 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted. Defendants are ordered to provide Plaintiff collateral in the amount of $3,900,000 to cover Plaintiff's financial exposure under the bonds. Plaintiff shall not disperse of the demanded funds until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/2/2012.(LFIG)
March 14, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A Temporary Restraining Order is hereby issued, see PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/14/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Insurance Company v. Simmons Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Simmons
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd G Simmons
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKS Investments & Developments LLC
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd G. Simmons Revocable Trust
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Construction LLC
Represented By: Kevin J Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard S Wisner
Represented By: Adam D Melton
Represented By: Andy J Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?