Jones # 202414 v. Forbs et al

Plaintiff: Theodore Jacob Jones
Defendant: Unknown Forbs and A Sanchez
Case Number: 2:2012cv00435
Filed: March 1, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): Defendants Beckford and Sanchez-Cepeda must answer the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for w aiver forms for the two defendants. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days of the date this Order is filed. ORDERED that counsel and any unrepresented party must comply with the Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/7/2014. (LFIG)
December 9, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court *ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 86 is GRANTED. Within 10 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file with the Clerk of Court the proposed Second Amended Complaint attached to his Motion for Leave to F ile an Amended Complaint. Upon the filing of the Second Amended Complaint, the Court will issue a service of process order regarding the two newly-named defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Relief From October 25, 201 3 Order Regarding Disclosure of Mental Health Records 92 is DENIED. Defendants must produce the subject mental health records within seven days of the entry of this Order, and file a notice of compliance with the August 26, 2013 Order within th at seven-day deadline. Absent a showing of good cause, defense counsel's failure to comply failure to comply with this Order will result in the setting of a show cause hearing and the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/9/2013. (ALS) *Modified judge's signature from Judge Aldon J Anderson to Judge Lawrence O Anderson; NEF regenerated on 12/9/2013 (SSU).
October 24, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Order re: Service; denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/24/12.(TLJ)
October 18, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Sanchez shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief by and including 10/23/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/18/12. (TLJ)
September 14, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Status of Service. ORDER that on or before Friday, 9/28/12, Defendant Sanchez shall provide under seal the last known address of Defendant Forbes to the Clerk's Office. Alternatively, Defendant San chez may file a notice accepting service on behalf of Defendant Forbes or Defendant Forbes may file a written waiver of service. Except for disclosure to the U.S. Marshals Service, Defendants addresses shall be kept confidential and any documents rel ating to service on a Defendant named herein shall be filed under seal. ORDER that upon receipt of the address for Defendant Forbes, the Clerk of Court shall complete service packet and forward it to the United States Marshal (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/13/12.(TLJ)
September 4, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 23 Motion to Compel; denying wihtout prejudice Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Forms; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/4/12.(REW)
July 26, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/26/12.(TLJ)
July 20, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's subpoena received on 7/17/12 18 , is QUASHED and shall not be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/20/12. (TLJ)
July 13, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Request to Order the Arizona Department of Corrections to Furnish the Address for (A Sanchez) [sic]. ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until 9/12/12 to discover by subpoena or otherwise the service information for Defendant Sanchez. ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue and send Plaintiff five subpoenas in blank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/13/12.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones # 202414 v. Forbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Forbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Jacob Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?