Worley # 257008 v. Correctional Medical Services

Plaintiff: Glenn Cornell Worley
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 2:2012cv00440
Filed: March 1, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment 36 is denied; the Clerk is directed to accept no further filings in this case except in connection with an appeal. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/21/13.(REW)
September 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 22 ; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 22 is granted; the claims are dismissed with prejudice; the case is terminated; the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/11/13. (REW)
November 21, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn with respect to only the 9/27/12 Motion for Reconsideration and Notice. All other matters will remain with the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's 9/27/12 Motion for Reconsideration 13 and Notice 14 are denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/21/12.(TLJ)
July 30, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counts II, III, IV and V; Defendants Vigil, Kendall and Ryan are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Fredrickson must answer. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including this Order, for Defendant Fredrickson. Pl aintiff must complete and return the service packet within 21 days. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey for all pretrail proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/28/2012. (See attached PDF for complete details.) (LFIG)
April 23, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Glenn Cornell Worley. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/23/12. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worley # 257008 v. Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Cornell Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?