Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) v. U.S. Prefab Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Defendant: U.S. Prefab Incorporated and Harry O Woody
Case Number: 2:2012cv00501
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 44 is granted, Count II of the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Interest Calculation 45 is granted; Judgment is entered on Count I of the Complaint in favo r of Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) and against Defendants U.S. Prefab, Inc. and Harry O. Woody, jointly and severally: (i) in the principal amount of $94,674.84; (ii) plus pre-judgment interest calculated at the rate of 10% per annum p ursuant to A.R.S. § 44-1201(A) from the date of the filing of the Complaint, March 9, 2012 to the date of this Judgment, in the total amount of $22,618.44; (iii) plus postjudgment simple interest at the rate of 0.11% per annum pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a) from the date of this Judgment until paid in full; to the extent that Plaintiff requests attorneys' fees and costs, Plaintiff must file a Motion in compliance with the deadlines and format specified in LRCiv 54.2. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/28/14. (REW)
March 25, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of the Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that partial summary judgment on Count I is granted to Plaintiff and against Defendants in the amount of $94,674.84 (the aggregate amount of unreimbursed claims against the Bond paid by Plaintiff), plus interest. The remaining damages sought in Count I and all of Count II shall proceed to trial. Within 5 days of the conclusion of trial Plaintiff shall submit a proposed form of judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/25/2014.(LFIG)
June 20, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Court Approval to Serve Certain Defendants by Publication as set forth herein. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/20/12.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) v. U.S. Prefab Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Prefab Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry O Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Represented By: Robert Jesse Berens
Represented By: Joseph Dean Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?