J & J Sports Productions Incorporated v. Mosqueda

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Incorporated
Defendant: Adrian Mosqueda
Case Number: 2:2012cv00523
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $510.00 in costs attributed to clerk's fees and fees for service of summons and subpoena. Plaintiff may not recover investigative fees. Plaintiff is not entitled to attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/2013.(DGC, nvo)
June 11, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 25 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Summary judgment is granted with respect to all claims except the claim under § 553, which is denied as moot. Defendant is ordered to pay $3,800 in damages. Plaintiff shall submit a request for costs and attorneys' fees pursuant to 47 U.S.C. § 605(e)(3)(V)(iii) and Local Rule 54.1 and 54.2 to the Court within 14 days. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/11/2013.(KMG)
March 12, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/12/2013.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions Incorporated v. Mosqueda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Mosqueda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?