Johnson v. Juvera et al

Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Defendant: Mark Reed, Unknown Juvera, Unknown Jackson, Larry Brown and David Cruz
Case Number: 2:2012cv00539
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: David K Duncan
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Eighth Amendment claim against Jackson is dismissed without prejudice and Jackson is dismissed as a Defendant. Pursuant to the Court's October 22, 2013 Order, the Clerk must enter judgment in favor of Brown, Cruz, Juvera, and Reed. The Clerk must terminate the action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/19/13. (LSP)
October 22, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE granting 118 Brown and Cruz's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 127 Juvera's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 130 Reed's Motion for Summary Judgment. Brown, Cruz, Juvera, and Reed are dismissed as Defendants. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff must show cause why Jackson and the remaining claim against him should not be dismissed for failure to serve. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/22/13.(LSP)
September 12, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 , and the Motion is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/11/12.(DMT)
March 27, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. Counts One and Two are dismissed without prejudice because they are duplicative. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet for defenda nts Juvera, Jackson, Cruz, Brown, and Reed. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/27/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Juvera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Juvera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?