Benitez v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Sergio Cortez Benitez
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2012cv00560
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court declines to revoke Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status for the appeal, re: 13-16926 37 USCA Referral Notice, 35 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/21/13. (REW)
August 21, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Maricopa County's Motion to Dismiss 27 ; Defendant Maricopa County's Motion to Dismiss 27 is granted; Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of exhaustion; the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/21/13. (REW)
March 19, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments of Remaining Balance of Inmate Filing Fee be made from Prison Account of Sergio Cortez Benitez. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/17/13. (REW)
November 15, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Plaintiff's constitutional claims for violation of his Fourteenth Amendment right to medical care and equal protection are dismissed without prejudice 12 ; Defendant Maricopa County must answer Plaintiff's claim for violation of his rights under the Americans with Disabilities Act 12 ; the Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint 12 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Maricopa County; Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days; this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/15/12. (REW)
August 8, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Extension of Time is granted to the extent that Plaintiff has an additional 45 days from the filing date of this Order in which to file a second amended complaint in compliance with the July 9, 2012, 9 O rder. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g).Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/8/2012.(LFIG)
July 9, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the First Amended Complaint 7 is dismissed for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order; if Plaintiff fails to file comply with this order, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/7/12. (REW)
June 7, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Segio Cortez Benitez. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/7/12. (REW)
April 27, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Sergio Cortez Benitez. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/26/12. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benitez v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Cortez Benitez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?