Baughman et al v. Roadrunner Communications LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ray Baughman, Cecil McDole and Tyler Stimbert
Defendant: Roadrunner Communications LLC, Brian E Rambo, Unknown Rambo, Hobie Dufort, Unknown Dufort, Lonnie M Densberger and Unknown Densberger
Case Number: 2:2012cv00565
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 189 Motion to Certify Class; denying 211 motion for ruling as moot. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/29/2014.(LMR)
August 13, 2014 212 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum of Decision and ORDER finding sua sponte that Claim 4 is subject to summary judgment. By Friday, August 29, 2014, Plaintiffs shall respond to the Court's sua sponte summary judgment determination regarding Claim 4. By Friday, September 12, 2014, Defendants are permitted to respond to Plaintiffs' arguments against summary judgment for Claim 4. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/13/2014. (ALS)
August 13, 2013 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 111 Motion to Strike Arizona State Law Rule 23 Class Allegations. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/12/2013.(LMR)
May 8, 2013 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/8/2013. (LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baughman et al v. Roadrunner Communications LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Baughman
Represented By: Matthew Edward Walls
Represented By: Michelle Ray Matheson
Represented By: Darrel Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil McDole
Represented By: Matthew Edward Walls
Represented By: Michelle Ray Matheson
Represented By: Darrel Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Stimbert
Represented By: Matthew Edward Walls
Represented By: Michelle Ray Matheson
Represented By: Darrel Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Communications LLC
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E Rambo
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rambo
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobie Dufort
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dufort
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie M Densberger
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Densberger
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?