ACT Group Incorporated v. Hamlin et al

Plaintiff: ACT Group Incorporated
Defendant: Jodi Hamlin, Waterfurnace International Incorporated and James Hamlin
Case Number: 2:2012cv00567
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting ACT's motion for summary judgment on Mr. Hamlin's counterclaim. (Doc. 107 .) Mr. Hamlins counterclaim (Doc. 64 ) is denied with prejudice and dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying WaterFurnace 9;s motion for summary judgment. (Doc. 115 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the parties' inquiry regarding thestatus of their motions for summary judgment. (Docs. 128 , 129 .) Status Conference set for 10/15/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/17/14. (LAD)
March 28, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 97 Motion to Modify Case Management Order and Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/28/2014.(LMR)
July 20, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Hamlin Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant WaterFurnace's 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff has leave of the Court to amend its complaint within 30 days consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/20/2012.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACT Group Incorporated v. Hamlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Hamlin
Represented By: Michael G Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfurnace International Incorporated
Represented By: Brian William Purcell
Represented By: Robert Thomas Aquinas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hamlin
Represented By: Michael G Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACT Group Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Mark D Bogard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?