Ramirez v. Phoenix, City of

Plaintiff: Ron Ramirez
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Case Number: 2:2012cv00639
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 72 Motion to Strike. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/3/14. (LAD)
July 24, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/24/13.(JWS)
February 7, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct. The proposed amended complaint shall be filed within seven (7) days. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/7/13.(JWS)
July 16, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 8 Motion for Summary Judgment. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/16/12.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Ramirez
Represented By: Michael Napier
Represented By: Kathryn Ruth Elizabeth Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Barry Harris Uhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?