Mendiola v. Arpaio

Plaintiff: Daniel Angel Mendiola
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2012cv00654
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff has 15 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with the July 18, 2012 Order and this Order. If Plaintiff fails to f ile a second amended complaint within 15 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/17/12.(DMT)
July 18, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the First Amended Complaint 9 is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dis missal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28:1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/17/12. (TLJ)
May 31, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must file a complete and signed Certificate, using the Certificate form provided with this Order, certifying that Plaintiff's signature on the Certificate shall serve as an original signature on his First Amended Complaint for the purposes Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If Plaintiff fails to file, within 30 days, a completed and signed Certificate on the form provided with this Order, the Clerk of Court must strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and enter a judgment of dismissal of this action, with prejudice and without further notice, that states that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/30/12. (DMT)
April 26, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Daniel Mendiola. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/25/12. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendiola v. Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Angel Mendiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?