West v. Mesa, City of et al

Plaintiff: Carl West
Defendant: Mesa, City of, Jeffrey Jacobs, Unknown Jacobs and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv00657
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Gordwin's motion to dismiss (Doc. 72 ) is granted in part and denied in part. 2. Gordwin's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 93 ) is denied. 3. Van Norman and Smith's motion to dismiss (Doc. 87 ) is granted. 4. The Unite d States and Jacobs' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 91 ) is granted. 5. The United States and Jacobs' motion to strike (Doc. 85 ) is granted. 6. The only remaining claims are counts two and four against Gordwin. 7. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/8/15. (LAD)
May 18, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant United States' motion for reconsideration 66 is granted and Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 68 is denied. Count four will be reinstated against the United States. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/15/2015. (ACL)
April 29, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Defendant City of Mesa's Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 36 Defendants United States, Truchon, and Jacobs' Motion to Dismiss. The claims that remain in this case are as follows: counts one through five against Gordwin; counts one through three against Van Norman and Smith; and count two against Jacobs. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/15.(LSP)
February 18, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 27 Motion to File a Consolidated Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. The litigation schedule is revised. Discovery due by 4/17/2015. Dispositive motions due by 7/10/2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/18/2015. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
February 2, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 30, 49, 82 in CV-14-254-PHX-DGC) are granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. The Motion to Amend and Motion to Dismiss Defendant Gray are granted (Doc. 74 and 79 in CV-14-254-PHX-DGC). The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 73 in CV-14-254-PHX-DGC) is granted and the litigation schedule is revised as set forth above. Discovery due by 4/1/2015. Dispositive motions due by 7/10/2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/2/2015. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
July 20, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant's 3 motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/19/2012.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Mesa, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl West
Represented By: David W Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa, City of
Represented By: Jason Keith Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Jacobs
Represented By: Jason Keith Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?