Fulton v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Carl David Fulton
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Unknown Hargrove
Case Number: 2:2012cv00658
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Reconsideration is denied; 14 "Motion to Obtain Transcripts, Documents, and... Relevant Data" is denied; 15 Motion to Adjust, Reduce, Suspend and/or Waive Court Fees is denied; 16 Motion to Request Conformed Copies is denied; 17 Motion for Discovery and to Appoint Counsel is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/1/2013.(LFIG)
August 7, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to the extent that Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint. Clerk must enter dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) if plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/7/12.(LSP)
May 1, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. The Complaint is dismissed with 30 days leave to amend. Clerk must enter dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) if plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/12/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulton v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl David Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?