Powell v. Magness

Plaintiff: Beauford B Powell
Defendant: Shawn Magness
Case Number: 2:2012cv00663
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied as moot. (Doc. 16 .) Plaintiff's motion for clarification is granted to the extent set forth herein. (Doc. 18 .) Defendant's motion to strike the Second Amended Complaint, doc. 19 , is granted and the Second Amended Complaint, doc. 15, is ordered stricken. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/17/2012.(KMG)
August 27, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline ; and 10 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/27/12.(DMT)
July 20, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Due Process and Equal Protection claims in Counts I and II are dismissed without prejudice. (Doc. 6 .) Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied. (Doc. 7 .) Defendant Magness must not answer or otherwise respond to the F irst Amended Complaint until further order of the Court. Pending further Court order, Defendant Magness must file a notice in this case regarding the status of Plaintiff's pending criminal cases in Maricopa County Superior Court every 90 days. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/20/2012. (KMG)
May 14, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Doc. 1.) Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Defendant's motion to screen the Complaint is denied as moot. (Doc. 3 .) Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied. (Doc. 4 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/14/2012. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beauford B Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Magness
Represented By: Shannon M Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?