Geddes et al v. HSBC Bank USA NA et al

Plaintiff: Richard Geddes and Delania Geddes
Defendant: Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, HSBC Bank USA NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, BMO Harris Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and M&I Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv00667
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 53 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/21/2013.(LFIG)
September 19, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendants' 34 Motion for Exoneration of the Bonds. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting defendants' 40 Motion for Summary Disposition and granting defendants' 32 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding fees to defendants in the amount of $14,000. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/18/2012.(LFIG)
June 1, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss, 14 Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order and 27 Motion to Expedite Consideration of the Motion to Dissolve the TRO. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/1/2012. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geddes et al v. HSBC Bank USA NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation
Represented By: Irina S Tanurcov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA NA
Represented By: Irina S Tanurcov
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Irina S Tanurcov
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By: Jeffrey Harold Verbin
Represented By: Laura Nelson Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Irina S Tanurcov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Irina S Tanurcov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&I Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Laura Nelson Hale
Represented By: Jeffrey Harold Verbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Geddes
Represented By: Donald O Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delania Geddes
Represented By: Donald O Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?