Modus LLC v. Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated

Plaintiff: Modus LLC
Defendant: Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated
Counter_claimant: Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated
Counter_defendant: Modus LLC
Thirdparty_defendant: Epiq Systems Incorporated
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00699
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying the Joint Motion Requesting Court to Vacate or Withdraw December 17, 2013 Order (Doc. 170 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. 171 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as mo ot the Motion for Sanctions Due to Plaintiff's Spoliation of Evidence and Discovery Misconduct (Doc. 121 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Modus, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 143 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the Stipulation to File Documents Under Seal (Doc. 145 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the Unopposed Motion to file Documents Under Seal (Doc. 158 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking the documents lodged at Docs. 146, 147, 148, and 159. The se documents shall remain under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Encore/Epiq's Motion for Summary Adjudication as to Liability (Doc. 156 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice all claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in this case. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/3/14. (LAD)
April 16, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's and Third-Party Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Answer, Counterclaim, and Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/16/14.(LSP)
December 17, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint. The motion is granted as to Encore and Epiq's claim for tortious interference with contractualrelations. T he motion is denied as to Encore and Epiqs claim for trade secret misappropriation. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Encore and Epiqs claim for injunctive relief to the extent such claim is based upon the claim for tortious interference with contractual relations. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/17/2013.(TLB)
September 10, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Encore's 27 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration, or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings. The motion to stay is granted. The motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied w ithout prejudice. That Encore shall file a status report on January 15, 2013. Denying without prejudice Modus's 18 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint. Vacating this Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. 29) and all deadlines set forth in that Order. Denying all other pending motions and stipulations, including the 47 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order andDefendants' 49 Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/10/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modus LLC v. Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Amy Abdo
Represented By: Kevin Michael Green
Represented By: Whitney Sedwick Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Modus LLC
Represented By: Tillman Finley
Represented By: Daniel Marino
Represented By: Bradley Hugh Schleier
Represented By: Tod F Schleier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Epiq Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modus LLC
Represented By: Tod F Schleier
Represented By: Bradley Hugh Schleier
Represented By: Daniel Marino
Represented By: Tillman Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Amy Abdo
Represented By: Kevin Michael Green
Represented By: Whitney Sedwick Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Encore Legal Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Amy Abdo
Represented By: Kevin Michael Green
Represented By: Whitney Sedwick Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?