Thompson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Dawn Michelle Thompson
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv00714
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, doc. 22 , is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded $10,605.54 in attorney's fees to be mailed to Plaintiff's counsel, Mark Caldwell, 1940 East Camelback Road, Suite 150, Phoenix, AZ 85016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/20/2013.(KMG)
October 8, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Defendant's Response is hereby STAYED (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/8/13.(TLJ)
July 2, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and this case is REMANDED to the Social Security Administration for an award of benefits. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/2/13. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Michelle Thompson
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Michael A Johns
Represented By: Thomas Henry Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?